IA HF2207 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Placed on calendar. H.J. 261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Placed on calendar. H.J. 261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the renewal of certain licenses issued by the electrical examining board.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the renewal of certain licenses issued by the electrical examining board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 261. |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 261. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 8:00AM House Lounge 2. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Bossman and Cooling. H.J. 184. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 151. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2207 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2207.html |