IA HF2255 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to parental authorization for minors to create accounts on social media platforms, providing civil penalties, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 2523.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to parental authorization for minors to create accounts on social media platforms, providing civil penalties, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 2523.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 535. |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2523. |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 260. |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 7:45AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Thomson, C., Scheetz and Wills, J. H.J. 197. |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 178. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2523 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Bennett, and Gruenhagen. S.J. 508.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2255 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2255.html |