IA HF2368 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 643.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 643.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the issuance of a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth, providing for a fee, and including effective date provisions. Effective 3-26-12.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the issuance of a certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth, providing for a fee, and including effective date provisions. Effective 3-26-12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 643. | |
2012-03-23 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 640. | |
2012-03-23 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 640. | |
2012-03-21 | Message from Senate. H.J. 628. | |
2012-03-21 | Immediate message. S.J. 614. | |
2012-03-21 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 614. | |
2012-03-14 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 563. | |
2012-03-07 | Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Bacon, and Hatch. S.J. 490. | |
2012-03-07 | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 484. | |
2012-03-07 | Message from House. S.J. 484. | |
2012-03-06 | Immediate message. H.J. 457. | |
2012-03-06 | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 456. | |
2012-03-06 | Amendment H-8088 adopted. H.J. 456. | |
2012-03-05 | Amendment H-8088 filed. H.J. 414. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 326. |