IA HF2392 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for academic and career guidance and career and technical education programs and requirements and workplace learning programs, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 620)
Title
A bill for an act providing for academic and career guidance and career and technical education programs and requirements and workplace learning programs, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 620)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 999. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 999. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 755. |
2016-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 699. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 98, nays none. H.J. 693. |
2016-04-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8198. H.J. 692. |
2016-04-14 | House | Senate amendment H-8198 filed. H.J. 653. |
2016-04-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 644. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 687. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 686. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Amendment S-5126 filed, adopted. S.J. 686. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 558. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee report, without recommendation. S.J. 475. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Subcommittee, Quirmbach, Schoenjahn, and Sinclair. S.J. 444. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 440. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 440. |
2016-03-03 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 415. |
2016-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 427. |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 404. |
2016-03-03 | House | Amendment H-8069 as amended, adopted. H.J. 404. |
2016-03-03 | House | Ruled not germane amendment H-8075 to amendment H-8069. H.J. 404. |
2016-03-03 | House | Point of order raised amendment H-8075 not germane to amendment H-8069. H.J. 404. |
2016-03-03 | House | Amendment H-8075 to amendment H-8069 filed. H.J. 404. |
2016-03-03 | House | Amendment H-8074 to amendment H-8069 filed, adopted. H.J. 404. |
2016-03-02 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-03-02 | House | Amendment H-8069 filed. H.J. 401. |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 286. |