IA HF2439 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 804.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 804.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the distribution and permissible expenditures of the emergency communications service surcharge and the duties of the E911 communications council. Effective 7-1-16.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the distribution and permissible expenditures of the emergency communications service surcharge and the duties of the E911 communications council. Effective 7-1-16.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 804. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 774. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 774. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 763. |
2016-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 721. |
2016-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 1. H.J. 717. |
2016-04-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8246. H.J. 717. |
2016-04-19 | House | Senate amendment H-8246 filed. H.J. 687. |
2016-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 668. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 730. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 730. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5135 adopted. S.J. 729. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Fiscal note, as amended. HCS. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5135 filed. S.J. 722. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 722. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, Danielson, Chapman, and Dvorsky. S.J. 677. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 597. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 597. |
2016-03-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 546. |
2016-03-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 551. |
2016-03-23 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 537. |
2016-03-23 | House | Amendment H-8139 adopted. H.J. 536. |
2016-03-22 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2016-03-22 | House | Amendment H-8139 filed. H.J. 524. |
2016-03-17 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 503. |