IA HF2446 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county medical examiner fees. (Formerly HF 530) (Formerly HSB 159)
Title
A bill for an act relating to county medical examiner fees. (Formerly HF 530) (Formerly HSB 159)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 999. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 999. |
2016-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 728. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 767. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 766. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 760. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee, Allen, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 691. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 669. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 669. |
2016-04-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 614. |
2016-04-11 | House | Amendment H-8165 lost. H.J. 613. |
2016-04-06 | House | Amendment H-8165 filed. H.J. 608. |
2016-03-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 554. |