IA HF2490 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the reorganization of county and state mutual insurance associations, nonrenewal notices for automobile insurance, and nonrenewal notices by county and state mutual insurance associations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 652.) Effective date: 07/01/2024, 01/01/2025
Title
A bill for an act relating to the reorganization of county and state mutual insurance associations, nonrenewal notices for automobile insurance, and nonrenewal notices by county and state mutual insurance associations, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 652.) Effective date: 07/01/2024, 01/01/2025
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/23. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 866. |
2024-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 829. |
2024-04-17 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 823. |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate Amendment H-8309. H.J. 823. |
2024-04-10 | House | Senate amendment H-8309 filed. H.J. 775. |
2024-04-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 762. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 792. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 791. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5140 filed, adopted. S.J. 791. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 611. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 458. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rowley, Schultz, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 402. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 351. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 351. |
2024-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 335. |
2024-03-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 495. |
2024-02-20 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 327. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 254. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB652 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2490.