IA HF2663 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to national training for personnel of county commissions of veteran affairs, and making appropriations. (Formerly HF 2285, HSB 620.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to national training for personnel of county commissions of veteran affairs, and making appropriations. (Formerly HF 2285, HSB 620.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01. |
2024-04-29 | House | NOBA: Final |
2024-04-23 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/23. |
2024-04-16 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2024-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 783. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 833. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 832. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Appropriations calendar. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 806. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Reichman, Costello, and Dotzler. S.J. 755. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Dotzler, and Reichman. S.J. 657. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 634. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 634. |
2024-03-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 656. |
2024-03-25 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays 0. H.J. 654. |
2024-03-22 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2024-03-19 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 613. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB620 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2285.
HF2285 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 656.
HF2285 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn. H.J. 656.