IA HF333 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Subcommittee: Webster, Bisignano, and McClintock. S.J. 439.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Subcommittee: Webster, Bisignano, and McClintock. S.J. 439.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the filing of complaints with the Iowa public information board.(Formerly HSB 145.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the filing of complaints with the Iowa public information board.(Formerly HSB 145.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Webster, Bisignano, and McClintock. S.J. 439. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 416. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 380. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 380. |
2023-02-22 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 407. |
2023-03-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 596. |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 403. |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 355. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1121 (Related) 2023-02-08 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
HSB145 (Related) 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 333.
HSB145 (Related) 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 333.