IA HF435 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the release of certain confidential information by the department of human services to multidisciplinary teams and making penalties applicable. (See HF 642.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the release of certain confidential information by the department of human services to multidisciplinary teams and making penalties applicable. (See HF 642.)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Fry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 524. |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382. |
2019-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2019 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-19 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Dolecheck and Konfrst. H.J. 314. |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 310. |
Same As/Similar To
HF642 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1082.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF435 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF435.html |