IA HF571 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 598.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 598.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the management of soil and water resources, including projects described in the Iowa nutrient reduction strategy, and the use of a county tax levy. (See HF 735.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the management of soil and water resources, including projects described in the Iowa nutrient reduction strategy, and the use of a county tax levy. (See HF 735.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 598. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 465. |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Abdul-Samad and Sexton. H.J. 400. |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 385. |
Same As/Similar To
HF735 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee: Behn, Boulton, and Sweeney. S.J. 728.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF571 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF571.html |