IA HF674 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Immediate message. H.J. 924.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Immediate message. H.J. 924.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to vehicles, including by providing for registration and titling of motor vehicles by any county treasurer, by modifying related fees and the amount of fees retained by county treasurers, and the definitions of terms for purposes of motor vehicle franchisers, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 344, HF 55.) Effective date: 07/01/2024, 01/01/2025
Title
A bill for an act relating to vehicles, including by providing for registration and titling of motor vehicles by any county treasurer, by modifying related fees and the amount of fees retained by county treasurers, and the definitions of terms for purposes of motor vehicle franchisers, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 344, HF 55.) Effective date: 07/01/2024, 01/01/2025
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - Shall amendment H–1238 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Shall amendment H–1238 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Shall amendment H–1238 be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 924. |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed House, yeas 59, nays 33. H.J. 918. |
2024-04-19 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8394. H.J. 917. |
2024-04-19 | House | Senate amendment H-8394 filed. H.J. 917. |
2024-04-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 906. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 946. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 43, nays 3. S.J. 946. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5196 adopted. S.J. 945. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5196 filed. S.J. 894. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 894. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2024 3:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Klimesh, Rowley, and T. Taylor. S.J. 631. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Koelker. S.J. 843. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 776. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 776. |
2023-04-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 824. |
2023-05-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1037. |
2023-04-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 65, nays 34. H.J. 820. |
2023-04-12 | House | Amendment H-1238, yeas 35, nays 64, filed, lost. H.J. 819. |
2023-03-22 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 678. |
Same As/Similar To
HF55 (Similar To) 2023-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 824.
SF80 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 380. S.J. 399.
SSB1053 (Related) 2023-01-17 - Subcommittee: Lofgren, Klimesh, and Weiner.
HF344 (Similar To) 2023-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 824.
SF380 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Fiscal note.
SF80 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 380. S.J. 399.
SSB1053 (Related) 2023-01-17 - Subcommittee: Lofgren, Klimesh, and Weiner.
HF344 (Similar To) 2023-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 824.
SF380 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Fiscal note.