IA HJR14 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 717.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 717.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the qualifications of electors. (Formerly HSB 68.)
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the qualifications of electors. (Formerly HSB 68.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 717. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Kinney, and Shipley. S.J. 563. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Chapman, and Hogg. S.J. 796. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 793. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 793. |
2019-03-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 688. |
2019-04-26 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1055. |
2019-03-28 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 2. H.J. 682. |
2019-03-20 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 480. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB68 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 467.
SSB1046 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB1046 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage.