IA HSB38 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF500
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electric standup scooters, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to electric standup scooters, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 334. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Lohse and B. Meyer. H.J. 136. |
2019-01-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1024 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF500 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 755.
HF500 (Replaced by) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 755.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB38 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB38.html |