IA HSB537 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2394
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2291
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2291
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Voted - Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - Voted - Commerce.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to various matters involving insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce, and including penalties.
Title
A study bill relating to various matters involving insurance and the insurance division of the department of commerce, and including penalties.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | Voted - Commerce. |
2016-02-11 | House | 12:30PM; House Lounge Commerce. |
2016-01-25 | House | Commerce: Pettengill Chair,Forbes, and Landon. |
2016-01-25 | House | In Commerce |
2016-01-25 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3019 (Related) 2016-02-16 - Voted - Commerce.
HF2394 (Replaced by) 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
SF2291 (Replaced by) 2016-04-12 - Withdrawn. S.J. 673.
HF2394 (Replaced by) 2016-05-04 - Sent to Governor. H.J. 999.
SF2291 (Replaced by) 2016-04-12 - Withdrawn. S.J. 673.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB537 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB537.html |