IA HSB539 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2360
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of genetic information provided to an insurer that offers health insurance, disability insurance, life insurance, or long-term care insurance.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of genetic information provided to an insurer that offers health insurance, disability insurance, life insurance, or long-term care insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/17/2024 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-01-10 | House | Subcommittee: Wilz, H., Srinivas and Wills, J. H.J. 72. |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 68. |
2024-01-10 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3138 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2360.
SF2360 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 309.
SF2360 (Replaced by) 2024-02-15 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 309.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB539 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB539.html |