IA HSB589 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2324
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to ambulatory surgical centers.(See HF 2324.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to ambulatory surgical centers.(See HF 2324.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2324. |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 162. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2024 1:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Bradley and Turek. H.J. 111. |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 109. |
2024-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2324 (Replaced by) 2024-02-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 428.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB589 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB589.html |