IA HSB723 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2427
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2710
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2710
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2710.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2710.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the duties and responsibilities of the department of revenue including confidentiality of records, sports wagering, the lottery, cigarette and tobacco taxes, alcoholic beverages, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2710.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the duties and responsibilities of the department of revenue including confidentiality of records, sports wagering, the lottery, cigarette and tobacco taxes, alcoholic beverages, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2710.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2710. |
2024-04-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 872. |
2024-03-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-02-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2024 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2024-02-21 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Bloomingdale and Croken. H.J. 362. |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 361. |
2024-02-21 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3179 (Related) 2024-04-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2427.
SF2427 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Message from House, with amendment S-5232. S.J. 950.
HF2710 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 911.
SF2427 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Message from House, with amendment S-5232. S.J. 950.
HF2710 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 911.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB723 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB723.html |