IA HSB731 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2662
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2662.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2662.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the Iowa film production incentive program and fund within the economic development authority.(See HF 2662.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the Iowa film production incentive program and fund within the economic development authority.(See HF 2662.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2662. |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 586. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 4-0. |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 12:30PM RM 304. |
2024-03-06 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Best, Isenhart, Jacoby and Siegrist. H.J. 537. |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 535. |
2024-03-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2662 (Replaced by) 2024-04-18 - Placed on Ways and Means calendar.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB731 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB731.html |