IA HSB737 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pesticides, by providing for license fees and tort liability.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pesticides, by providing for license fees and tort liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2024-03-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2024 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2024-03-12 | House | Subcommittee: Thompson, P., Harris and Nielsen. H.J. 577. |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 576. |
2024-03-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB737 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB737.html |