IA SF138 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing airbows as a legal method of take during firearm deer hunting seasons.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing airbows as a legal method of take during firearm deer hunting seasons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 1:00PM Room 315. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, De Witt, and Knox. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 184. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF138 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF138.html |