IA SF160 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 208.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 208.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to temporary in-person and remote learning instruction and instructional time requirements for school districts and accredited nonpublic schools, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1064.) Effective date: 01/29/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to temporary in-person and remote learning instruction and instructional time requirements for school districts and accredited nonpublic schools, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1064.) Effective date: 01/29/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3003 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3004 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3003 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3004 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 18 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 208. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 208. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 200. |
2021-01-28 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 252. |
2021-01-28 | House | Passed House, yeas 59, nays 39. H.J. 252. |
2021-01-28 | House | Substituted for HF 229. H.J. 251. |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 244. |
2021-01-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 242. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 188. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 29, nays 18. S.J. 187. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3001 adopted. S.J. 187. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3005 to S-3001 filed, lost. S.J. 186. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3001 filed. S.J. 186. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3004 filed, lost. S.J. 186. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3003 filed, lost. S.J. 185. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 181. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 162. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 157. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1064 (Related) 2021-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 160.
HF103 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 252.
HF229 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 252.
HF103 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 252.
HF229 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 252.