IA SF180 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 486. S.J. 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 486. S.J. 489.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing law enforcement agencies to retain possession of motor vehicles suspected to have been used to elude law enforcement vehicles. (See SF 486.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing law enforcement agencies to retain possession of motor vehicles suspected to have been used to elude law enforcement vehicles. (See SF 486.)
Sponsors
Sen. Roby Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 486. S.J. 489. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Chapman. S.J. 272. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 227. |
Same As/Similar To
SF486 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 858.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF180 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF180.html |