IA SF2086 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting certain structures from inclusion in property assessments, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act exempting certain structures from inclusion in property assessments, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/11/2024 12:00PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Dotzler, and Koelker. S.J. 227. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 135. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2086 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2086.html |