IA SF2095 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing county attorneys and assistant county attorneys to obtain a professional permit to carry weapons. (Formerly SF 587, SSB 1007.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing county attorneys and assistant county attorneys to obtain a professional permit to carry weapons. (Formerly SF 587, SSB 1007.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2020 12:50PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Bennett and Mitchell. H.J. 307. |
2020-02-07 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 219. |
2020-02-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 215. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 232. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 264. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 1. S.J. 230. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 165. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 157. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1007 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
SF587 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2095. S.J. 165.
SF587 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2095. S.J. 165.