IA SF2116 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonpedestrian travel on roadways based on lane designations, including the manner of overtaking other vehicles, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 3090.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonpedestrian travel on roadways based on lane designations, including the manner of overtaking other vehicles, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 3090.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2024 12:15PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee: Meggers, Cooling and Wulf. H.J. 555. |
2024-02-20 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 322. |
2024-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 321. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 346. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 38, nays 8. S.J. 343. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 155. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 149. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3090 (Related) 2024-01-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2116.