IA SF2198 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the issuance of a paddlefish fishing license and tag and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3003.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the issuance of a paddlefish fishing license and tag and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3003.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 719. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 674. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 640. |
2014-03-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 577. |
2014-03-26 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 601. |
2014-03-25 | House | Passed House, ayes 94, nays none. H.J. 572. |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 557. |
2014-03-18 | House | Subcommittee, Forristall, Maxwell, and Thomas. H.J. 533. |
2014-03-18 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 506. |
2014-03-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 505. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 568. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 565. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 550. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 544. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee, Black, Behn, and Seng. S.J. 393. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 290. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 277. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 266. |