IA SF2228 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 822.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 822.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the licensure of genetic counselors, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and implementation provisions. (Formerly SSB 3005.) Effective 1-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the licensure of genetic counselors, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and implementation provisions. (Formerly SSB 3005.) Effective 1-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 822. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 793. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 647. |
2018-03-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 566. |
2018-03-12 | House | Passed House, ayes 97 nays 1. H.J. 565. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 448. |
2018-02-28 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Heaton and Heddens. H.J. 430. |
2018-02-27 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 398. |
2018-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 394. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 439. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 1. S.J. 437. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 279. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 275. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3005 (Related) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.