IA SF2278 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to information required for nonresidents who apply for vehicle registration and issuance of a certificate of title.(Formerly SSB 3105.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to information required for nonresidents who apply for vehicle registration and issuance of a certificate of title.(Formerly SSB 3105.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2024 10:30AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Klimesh, and T. Taylor. S.J. 561. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 538. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Amendment S-5054 filed. S.J. 460. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 261. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 249. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3105 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2278.