IA SF2309 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Sent to Governor. S.J. 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for tax credits and refunds relating to renewable fuels including their component biofuels and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2052 and SF 2223.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for tax credits and refunds relating to renewable fuels including their component biofuels and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2052 and SF 2223.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 0. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 763. |
2016-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 721. |
2016-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 88, nays 6. H.J. 720. |
2016-04-21 | House | Substituted for HF 2462. H.J. 720. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed on file. H.J. 700. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 645. |
2016-04-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 640. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 682. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 692. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 679. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 654. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 653. |