IA SF2328 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 762.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 762.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the reorganization of the Code provisions relating to the Iowa finance authority, revising and eliminating programs, including the beginning farm loan program, providing for existing tax credits, providing for the powers and duties of the authority, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3141.) Various effective dates; see bill.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the reorganization of the Code provisions relating to the Iowa finance authority, revising and eliminating programs, including the beginning farm loan program, providing for existing tax credits, providing for the powers and duties of the authority, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3141.) Various effective dates; see bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 762. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 734. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 734. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 623. |
2014-03-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 555. |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 553. |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 496. |
2014-03-12 | House | Subcommittee, Moore, Baltimore, and Gaskill. H.J. 488. |
2014-03-04 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 415. |
2014-03-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 413. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 465. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 463. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5041 filed, adopted. S.J. 463. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 411. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 410. |