IA SF2338 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 819.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 819.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to department of transportation employees designated as peace officers, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3059.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to department of transportation employees designated as peace officers, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3059.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 819. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | HF 2345 substituted. S.J. 818. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5144 filed, adopted. S.J. 818. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 553. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2345. S.J. 418. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 333. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 319. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB533 (Related) 2022-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2345.
SSB3059 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2338.
HF2345 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
SSB3059 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2338.
HF2345 (Similar To) 2022-05-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 901.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF2338 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF2338.html |