IA SF2353 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-21 - Read first time, referred to Economic Growth. H.J. 770.
Pending: House Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-21 - Read first time, referred to Economic Growth. H.J. 770.
Pending: House Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the jobs training and apprenticeship programs and making appropriations. (Formerly SSB 3052 and SF 2317.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the jobs training and apprenticeship programs and making appropriations. (Formerly SSB 3052 and SF 2317.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Economic Growth. H.J. 770. |
2014-04-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 770. |
2014-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 808. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 20. S.J. 800. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5160 adopted. S.J. 800. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5158 withdrawn. S.J. 799. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5161 lost. S.J. 799. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Amendments S-5158, S-5160, and S-5161 filed. S.J. 796. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 785. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 785. |