IA SF289 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the boards of directors of area education agencies, school districts, and school corporations, and to the election of a director as school board president. (Formerly SSB 1133.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the boards of directors of area education agencies, school districts, and school corporations, and to the election of a director as school board president. (Formerly SSB 1133.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 666. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 665. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 571. |
2021-03-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 679. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 698. |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays none. H.J. 662. |
2021-03-09 | House | Substituted for HF 622. H.J. 661. |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 540. |
2021-02-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 528. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 436. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 433. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 302. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 293. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB146 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 622.
SSB1133 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 289.
HF622 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.
SSB1133 (Related) 2021-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 289.
HF622 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 679.