IA SF380 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 524. S.J. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 524. S.J. 509.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sexual exploitation by a youth athletics coach and providing penalties. (See SF 524.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to sexual exploitation by a youth athletics coach and providing penalties. (See SF 524.)
Sponsors
Sen. Roby Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 524. S.J. 509. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Chapman, and Kinney. S.J. 432. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 401. |
Same As/Similar To
SF524 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF380 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF380.html |