IA SF382 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 526.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 526.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to domestic abuse, including provisions relating to the implementation of a domestic abuse lethality screening assessment and supervised electronic tracking and monitoring. (See SF 578.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to domestic abuse, including provisions relating to the implementation of a domestic abuse lethality screening assessment and supervised electronic tracking and monitoring. (See SF 578.)
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Nunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 526. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Nunn, Hogg, and Sweeney. S.J. 419. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 402. |
Same As/Similar To
SF578 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 859.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF382 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF382.html |