IA SF387 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 865.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 865.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology arts and sciences and providing transition provisions.(Formerly SSB 1108.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology arts and sciences and providing transition provisions.(Formerly SSB 1108.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 865. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | HF 652 substituted. S.J. 864. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3156 filed, adopted. S.J. 864. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Attached to HF 652. S.J. 695. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 398. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 392. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1108 (Related) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 387.
HSB211 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 652.
HF652 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.
HSB211 (Related) 2023-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 652.
HF652 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.