IA SF512 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring the installation and maintenance of train defect detectors on railway branch lines, and providing penalties.(Formerly SF 337.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring the installation and maintenance of train defect detectors on railway branch lines, and providing penalties.(Formerly SF 337.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Webster, and Winckler. S.J. 78. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. S.J. 1092. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 476. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 463. |
Same As/Similar To
SF337 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 512. S.J. 476.