IA SF546 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 905.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. S.J. 905.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1172.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to statutory corrections which may adjust language to reflect current practices, insert earlier omissions, delete redundancies and inaccuracies, delete temporary language, resolve inconsistencies and conflicts, update ongoing provisions, or remove ambiguities, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1172.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 905. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | HF 679 substituted. S.J. 904. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment S-3013 adopted. S.J. 904. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 679. S.J. 743. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Amendment S-3013 filed. S.J. 511. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 511. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 502. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1172 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 1:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
HSB203 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 420.
HF679 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor.
HSB203 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 420.
HF679 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF546 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF546.html |