IA SF550 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, and Koelker. S.J. 60.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, and Koelker. S.J. 60.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local revenue and finances by modifying sales and use taxes, the charitable conservation contribution tax credit available against individual and corporate income taxes, the water service tax, property taxes, transit funding, and local option taxes, crediting moneys to the natural resources and outdoor recreation trust fund, modifying allocations of road use tax fund moneys, making appropriations, and including effective date, retroactive applicability, and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1125.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local revenue and finances by modifying sales and use taxes, the charitable conservation contribution tax credit available against individual and corporate income taxes, the water service tax, property taxes, transit funding, and local option taxes, crediting moneys to the natural resources and outdoor recreation trust fund, modifying allocations of road use tax fund moneys, making appropriations, and including effective date, retroactive applicability, and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1125.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, and Koelker. S.J. 60. |
2023-12-31 | Senate | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1092. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 723. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 548. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 547. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1125 (Related) 2023-03-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 550.