IA SF627 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1122.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1122.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to taking a capital gain deduction for the sale of real property used in a farming business. (Formerly SF 192.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to taking a capital gain deduction for the sale of real property used in a farming business. (Formerly SF 192.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1122. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | HF 778 substituted. S.J. 1121. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 778. S.J. 1103. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1010. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1008. |
Same As/Similar To
SF192 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 627. S.J. 1010.
HSB188 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 925.
HF778 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
HSB188 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 925.
HF778 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF627 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF627.html |