IA SF628 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 533.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 533.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the excise taxes on motor fuel and certain special fuel, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1246; See SF 2403.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the excise taxes on motor fuel and certain special fuel, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1246; See SF 2403.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 533. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2020 3:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Sweeney, and Wahls. S.J. 217. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1010. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1008. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1246 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2403 (Similar To) 2020-07-17 - Fiscal note.
SF2403 (Similar To) 2020-07-17 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF628 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF628.html |