IA SSB1015 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF153
Note: Legislation replaced by HF323
Note: Legislation replaced by HF323
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the exploitation of a dependent adult by a caretaker.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the exploitation of a dependent adult by a caretaker.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney and Shipley. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB21 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 231.
SF153 (Replaced by) 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 918.
HF323 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 981.
SF153 (Replaced by) 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 918.
HF323 (Replaced by) 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 981.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1015 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1015.html |