IA SSB1096 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF595
Note: Legislation replaced by SF508
Note: Legislation replaced by SF508
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 508.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 508.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances including the manufacture, delivery, or possession of a controlled substance including fentanyl; the manufacture of a controlled substance in the presence of a minor; conspiracy to manufacture for delivery or delivery or intent or conspiracy to deliver a controlled substance to a minor; receipt, provision, and administration of opioid antagonists, including by secondary distributors, providing for immunity; and providing penalties.(See SF 508.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances including the manufacture, delivery, or possession of a controlled substance including fentanyl; the manufacture of a controlled substance in the presence of a minor; conspiracy to manufacture for delivery or delivery or intent or conspiracy to deliver a controlled substance to a minor; receipt, provision, and administration of opioid antagonists, including by secondary distributors, providing for immunity; and providing penalties.(See SF 508.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 508. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2023 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Bisignano, and Webster. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB104 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 595.
HF595 (Replaced by) 2023-05-22 - Fiscal note.
SF508 (Replaced by) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 817.
HF595 (Replaced by) 2023-05-22 - Fiscal note.
SF508 (Replaced by) 2023-04-17 - Withdrawn. S.J. 817.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1096 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1096.html |