IA SSB3035 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2316
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2308
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2308
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing an alternative to filing a bond as a condition of registering and titling certain motor vehicles.(See SF 2308.)
Title
A bill for an act providing an alternative to filing a bond as a condition of registering and titling certain motor vehicles.(See SF 2308.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2308. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2024 10:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Webster, Koelker, and Winckler. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB553 (Related) 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2316.
HF2316 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SF2308 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 597.
HF2316 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 773.
SF2308 (Replaced by) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 597.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3035 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3035.html |