IA SSB3200 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2434
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2693
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2693
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2434.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2434.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(See SF 2434.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(See SF 2434.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2434. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Sub |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/03/2024 2:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Reichman, and Taylor, T. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2434 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 922.
HF2693 (Replaced by) 2024-04-26 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26.
HF2693 (Replaced by) 2024-04-26 - Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26.