IA SSB3207 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2442
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2442.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2442.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by modifying individual and alternate income tax rates, withholding credits, franchise tax deductions, methodologies for determining property taxes, and property tax assessment limitations, changing methods of determining compensation of county officials, making contingent transfers from the taxpayer relief fund, and making corrections, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 2442.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by modifying individual and alternate income tax rates, withholding credits, franchise tax deductions, methodologies for determining property taxes, and property tax assessment limitations, changing methods of determining compensation of county officials, making contingent transfers from the taxpayer relief fund, and making corrections, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 2442.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2442. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/18/2024 8:00AM Room 315. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Schultz. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2442 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB3207 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB3207.html |