ID H0006 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-26 - SECTION 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-26 - SECTION 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CORONAVIRUS LIMITED IMMUNITY ACT -- Adds to existing law to provide limited immunity resulting from coronavirus.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide limited immunity resulting from coronavirus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-26 | House | SECTION 1 |
2020-08-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on August 27, 2020 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: 08/27/2020; 07/01/2021 Sunset Clause |
2020-08-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:15 p.m. on August 26, 2020 |
2020-08-26 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-08-26 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-08-26 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-08-26 | Senate | to House |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 27-7-1 |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-08-26 | House | to Senate |
2020-08-26 | House | Title apvd |
2020-08-26 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-08-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-08-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2020-08-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |