ID H0025 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2023 Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 04/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2023 Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 04/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
CAPITOL BUILDING AND GROUNDS -- Adds to existing law to authorize the director of the Department of Administration to control the use of the roadways adjoining the Capitol building.
Title
Adds to existing law to authorize the director of the Department of Administration to control the use of the roadways adjoining the Capitol building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2023 Session Law Chapter 309 Effective: 04/05/2023 |
2023-03-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:05 p.m. on March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-31 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-31 | House | to enrol |
2023-03-31 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-31 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-31 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2023-03-30 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2023-03-30 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2023-03-30 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 23-11-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-02-10 | House | to Senate |
2023-02-10 | House | Title apvd |
2023-02-10 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-22-3 |
2023-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-02-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-02-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-02-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-02-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 6, 2023 |
2023-02-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-02-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-01-26 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |