ID H0340 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2023 Session Law Chapter 293 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2023 Session Law Chapter 293 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VOTER IDENTIFICATION -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding voter identification and proof of residence.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding voter identification and proof of residence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2023 Session Law Chapter 293 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on March 30, 2023 |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2023-03-28 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 23-12-0 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-03-21 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-21 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |